NH SB59 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on June 28 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Enrolled 06/27/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Adding post traumatic stress disorder and acute stress disorder to the definition of "injury" for purposes of workers' compensation, establishing the commission to study the incidence of post-traumatic stress disorder in first responders, and clarifying workers' compensation for firefighter and heart, lung, or cancer disease.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adding post traumatic stress disorder and acute stress disorder to the definition of "injury" for purposes of workers' compensation, establishing the commission to study the incidence of post-traumatic stress disorder in first responders, and clarifying workers' compensation for firefighter and heart, lung, or cancer disease.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - Senate - Concur (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-28HouseEnrolled 06/27/2019
2019-06-28SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-06-12SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2435e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20
2019-06-12HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2435e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/06/2019
2019-05-30SenateSen. Cavanaugh Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Regular Calendar 20Y-3N, Motion Adopted; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18
2019-05-08HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1676h (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 30
2019-05-08HouseAmendment # 2019-1676h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 30
2019-05-01HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1676h for 05/08/2019 (Vote 19-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 10
2019-04-24HouseExecutive Session: 05/01/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 307
2019-04-17HousePublic Hearing on non-germane Amendment # 2019-1516h (NT): 04/24/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305-307
2019-04-16House==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 04/17/2019 08:30 am Legislative Office Building 307
2019-04-10House==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 04/17/2019 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 307
2019-04-03HousePublic Hearing: 04/10/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 307
2019-03-21HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services House Journal 11 P. 69
2019-02-14SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0187s, Regular Calendar 23Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5
2019-02-14SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-0187s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5
2019-02-14SenateSpecial Order to After Energy and Natural Resources, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5
2019-02-04SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0187s, 02/14/2019; Senate Calendar 10
2019-01-23SenateHearing: 01/29/2019, Room 103, State House, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 8
2019-01-17SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback