NH SB584 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to policies for students with head injuries.
Title
Relative to policies for students with head injuries.
Sponsors
Sen. David Watters [D] | Sen. Cindy Rosenwald [D] | Sen. Bob Giuda [R] | Sen. Jay Kahn [D] |
Rep. Glenn Cordelli [R] | Rep. Roderick Ladd [R] | Rep. Chuck Grassie [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-23 | House | Died on Table |
2020-06-30 | House | Vacated and Laid on Table Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 3 |
2020-03-11 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 03/17/2020 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2020-03-02 | House | Introduced 02/20/2020 and referred to Education House Journal 5 P. 56 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0479s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/13/2020; Senate Journal 4 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2020-0479s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/13/2020; Senate Journal 4 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0479s, 02/13/2020; Senate Calendar 6 |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Hearing: 01/21/2020, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 3 |
2020-01-06 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Education and Workforce Development; Senate Journal 1 |