NH SB584 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting electroconvulsive therapy on children 16 years of age or under.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting electroconvulsive therapy on children 16 years of age or under.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08SenateInexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6
2018-03-07SenateCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; 03/08/2018; Senate Calendar 10A
2018-02-08SenateHearing: 02/20/2018, Room 100, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 7
2018-01-17SenateIntroduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 2

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback