NH SB583 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 03/15/2018; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 03/15/2018; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a pilot program to eliminate employment barriers for certain parents.
Title
Establishing a pilot program to eliminate employment barriers for certain parents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 03/15/2018; Senate Journal 8 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/15/2018; Senate Calendar 12A |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/08/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 10A |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Hearing: 01/23/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 4 |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 2 |