NH SB576 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-19 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 180-154 04/19/2018 House Journal 13 P. 20
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-19 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 180-154 04/19/2018 House Journal 13 P. 20
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to home health services rate setting.
Title
Relative to home health services rate setting.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-19 - House - ITL (Y: 180 N: 154 NV: 24 Abs: 34) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-19 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 180-154 04/19/2018 House Journal 13 P. 20 |
2018-04-12 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2018-04-12 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 04/19/2018 (Vote 15-11; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 12 |
2018-04-05 | House | Executive Session: 04/11/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2018-04-05 | House | Division III Work Session: 04/06/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2018-03-29 | House | Public Hearing: 04/03/2018 03:30 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2018-03-27 | House | Introduced 03/22/2018 and referred to Finance House Journal 10 P. 53 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-1182s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/22/2018; Senate Journal 10 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment # 2018-1182s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/22/2018; Senate Journal 10 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved Ought to Pass; 03/22/2018; Senate Journal 10 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Failed, Voice Vote; 03/22/2018; Senate Journal 10 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved to Remove From Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/22/2018; Senate Journal 10 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Pending Motion Inexpedient to Legislate; 02/22/2018; Senate Journal 5 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/22/2018; Senate Journal 5 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 02/22/2018; Senate Calendar 8 |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Hearing: 02/06/2018, Room 103, State House, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 6 |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 2 |