NH SB573 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to criminal threats to school safety.
Title
Relative to criminal threats to school safety.
Sponsors
Sen. Jay Kahn [D] | Sen. David Watters [D] | Rep. Roderick Ladd [R] | Sen. Martha Hennessey [D] |
Sen. Shannon Chandley [D] | Rep. Jon Morgan [D] | Rep. David Luneau [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-23 | House | Died on Table |
2020-06-30 | House | Vacated and Laid on Table Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 3 |
2020-03-11 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 03/17/2020 10:45 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2020-02-03 | House | Introduced 01/09/2020 and referred to Education House Journal 2 P. 59 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 01/30/2020; Senate Journal 2 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 01/30/2020; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 4 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Hearing: 01/21/2020, Room 100, State House, 10:30 am; Senate Calendar 2 |
2020-01-02 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 1 |