NH SB57 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-20 - Remote Hearing: 01/27/2021, 09:40 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 8
Pending: Senate Executive Departments and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to allowing pharmacy technicians and interns to remotely perform non-dispensing tasks.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to allowing pharmacy technicians and interns to remotely perform non-dispensing tasks.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-20SenateRemote Hearing: 01/27/2021, 09:40 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 8
2021-01-19SenateIntroduced 01/06/2021 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 3

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback