NH SB568 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-14 - Pending Motion Ought to Pass; 03/14/2018; Senate Journal 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-14 - Pending Motion Ought to Pass; 03/14/2018; Senate Journal 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to criminal history record checks for school employees and certain volunteers.
Title
Relative to criminal history record checks for school employees and certain volunteers.
Sponsors
Sen. John Reagan [R] | Sen. Bob Giuda [R] | Sen. Ruth Ward [R] | Sen. David Watters [D] |
Sen. Jay Kahn [D] | Rep. Roderick Ladd [R] | Rep. Glenn Cordelli [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-14 - Senate - Sen. Reagan Floor Amendment 1033s (Y: 1 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-14 | Senate | Pending Motion Ought to Pass; 03/14/2018; Senate Journal 7 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2018; Senate Journal 7 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Sen. Reagan Floor Amendment # 2018-1033s, Regular Calendar 1Y-23N, Amendment Failed; 03/14/2018; Senate Journal 7 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-0965s, Amendment Failed, Voice Vote; 03/14/2018; Senate Journal 7 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0965s, 03/08/2018; Senate Calendar 10A |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0965s, 03/14/2018; Senate Calendar 11 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Special Order to next session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Hearing: 02/20/2018, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:15 am, on proposed amendment # 2018-0669s; Senate Calendar 8 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Hearing: 02/20/2018, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 8 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Hearing: ===RECESSED=== 02/13/2018, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 6 |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 2 |