NH SB564 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-04 - Signed by the Governor on 05/30/2018; Chapter 0157; Effective 07/29/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to a business tax exemption and a workforce development program for regenerative manufacturing businesses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to a business tax exemption and a workforce development program for regenerative manufacturing businesses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-23 - Senate - Adopt CofC (Y: 259 N: 79 NV: 28 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - OTPA (Y: 241 N: 50 NV: 62 Abs: 38) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Sen. Feltes Floor Amendment 1159s (Y: 4 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-04SenateSigned by the Governor on 05/30/2018; Chapter 0157; Effective 07/29/2018
2018-05-30HouseEnrolled 05/23/2018
2018-05-30SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18
2018-05-29SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-2101e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18
2018-05-29HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-2101e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2018
2018-05-23SenateConference Committee Report # 2018-1972c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2018; Senate Journal 18
2018-05-23HouseConference Committee Report 1972c: Adopted, Regular Calendar 259-79 05/23/2018
2018-05-15HouseConference Committee Report # 2018-1972c Filed 05/15/2018; House Amendment + New Amendment
2018-05-11SenateSen. Sanborn Withdraws the motion to Concur with the House Amendment; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17
2018-05-10SenateCommittee of Conference Meeting: 05/14/2018, 11:00 am, Room 100, State House
2018-05-10SenatePresident Appoints: Senators Bradley, Sanborn, D'Allesandro; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17
2018-05-10SenateSen. Sanborn Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17
2018-05-10SenateSen. Bradley Moved to Reconsider the following action taken by this body on SB 564: the vote on Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17
2018-05-10SenateSen. Bradley Moved to suspend all rules necessary to permit the consideration of SB 564-FN; 2/3 necessary, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17
2018-05-10HouseSpeaker Appoints: Reps. Major, Hinch, Abrami, Almy 05/10/2018
2018-05-10HouseHouse Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Rep. Major): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018
2018-05-02SenateSen. Sanborn Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15
2018-04-26HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 1535h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 241-50 04/26/2018
2018-04-26HouseAmendment # 2018-1535h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/26/2018
2018-04-18HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2018-04-18HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1535h for 04/26/2018 (Vote 22-1; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 16
2018-04-18HouseExecutive Session: 04/18/2018 Legislative Office Building 202
2018-04-12House==RESCHEDULED== Full Committee Work Session: 04/17/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 202
2018-04-11House==CANCELLED== Full Committee Work Session: 04/18/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 202
2018-04-04HouseFull Committee Work Session: 04/11/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202
2018-04-04House==CONTINUED== Public Hearing: 04/10/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202
2018-03-28House==RECESSED== Public Hearing: 04/04/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202
2018-03-27HouseIntroduced 03/22/2018 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 10 P. 53
2018-03-22SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2018-1158s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/22/2018; Senate Journal 10
2018-03-22SenateSen. Feltes Floor Amendment # 2018-1159s, Regular Calendar 4Y-19N, Amendment Failed; 03/22/2018; Senate Journal 10
2018-03-22SenateCommittee Amendment # 2018-1158s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/22/2018; Senate Journal 10
2018-03-20SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1158s, 03/22/2018; Senate Calendar 13A
2018-03-08SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2018-1005s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/08/2015; Senate Journal 6
2018-03-08SenateCommittee Amendment # 2018-1005s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/08/2015; Senate Journal 6
2018-03-07SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1005s, 03/08/2018; Senate Calendar 10A
2018-01-30SenateHearing: 02/07/2018, Room 100, State House, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 6
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 2

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2919&sy=2018&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=SB564
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2018&id=1935&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2018&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=1935
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2018&txtFormat=html&v=SA2&id=1935
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2018&txtFormat=html&v=HA&id=1935
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=139&sy=2018&lb=S&eb=SB0564&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=SB564&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2919
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=197&sy=2018&lb=H&eb=SB0564&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=SB564&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2919
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=237&sy=2018&lb=H&eb=SB0564&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=SB564&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2919

Bill Comments

feedback