NH SB56 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - II. Remainder Effective 06/12/15
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - II. Remainder Effective 06/12/15
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a commission to study oversight, regulation, and reporting of patient safety and infectious disease prevention and control issues in health care settings.
Title
Establishing a commission to study oversight, regulation, and reporting of patient safety and infectious disease prevention and control issues in health care settings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-16 | Senate | II. Remainder Effective 06/12/15 |
2015-06-16 | Senate | I. Section 3 Effective 11/01/15 |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/12/2015; Chapter 0147 |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 5/28/2015); Senate Journal 17 |
2015-06-03 | House | Enrolled |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2015-1839e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 5/21/2015); Senate Journal 16 |
2015-05-21 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2015-1839EBA: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of 5/6/2015); House Journal 41, PG. 1782 |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Sen. Sanborn Concurs with House Amendment #1227h, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 14 |
2015-04-15 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #1227h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 34, PG. 1540-1541 |
2015-04-15 | House | Amendment #1227h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 34, PG. 1540-1541 |
2015-04-09 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1227h (NT) for Apr 15 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 29, PG. 1304 |
2015-04-01 | House | Executive Session: 4/7/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2015-03-25 | House | ==CANCELED==Executive Session: 4/2/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2015-03-24 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 3/31/2015 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2015-03-18 | House | Public Hearing: 3/24/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2015-03-04 | House | Introduced and Referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs; House Journal 22, PG. 629 |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 5 |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 2/12/15; Senate Calendar 9 |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Hearing: 1/20/15, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 6 |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 4 |