NH SB550 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-10 - Signed by the Governor on 06/03/2016; Chapter 0193; Effective 06/30/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-10 - Signed by the Governor on 06/03/2016; Chapter 0193; Effective 06/30/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the maximum gross weight for dump trailers.
Title
Relative to the maximum gross weight for dump trailers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/03/2016; Chapter 0193; Effective 06/30/2016 |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/19/2016); Senate Journal 19 |
2016-05-23 | House | Enrolled 05/19/2016 House Journal 39 P. 24 |
2016-05-11 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 119 |
2016-04-28 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 05/11/2016 (Vote 15-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 29 P. 30 |
2016-04-20 | House | Executive Session: 04/26/2016 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2016-04-06 | House | Public Hearing: 04/12/2016 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2016-03-15 | House | Introduced 03/10/2016 and referred to Transportation House Journal 25 P. 118 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0835s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/10/2016; Senate Journal 8 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0835s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/10/2016 Senate Journal 8 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-0835s, 03/10/2016; Senate Calendar 9 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Hearing: 02/16/2016, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 01:25 pm; Senate Calendar 5 |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Introduced 01/21/2016 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 3 |