NH SB55 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 03/11/2021; Senate Journal 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 03/11/2021; Senate Journal 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to project labor agreements in government contracts.
Title
Relative to project labor agreements in government contracts.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Avard [R] | Sen. Gary Daniels [R] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Rep. John Burt [R] |
Rep. Keith Ammon [R] | Sen. Timothy Lang [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 03/11/2021; Senate Journal 7 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; 03/11/2021; Senate Calendar 14 |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 01/27/2021, 09:00 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 8 |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Introduced 01/06/2021 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 3 |