NH SB549 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Signed by the Governor on 06/26/2018; Chapter 0336; Effective 06/26/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Signed by the Governor on 06/26/2018; Chapter 0336; Effective 06/26/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to plans of safe care for infants affected by substance abuse or withdrawal symptoms from prenatal drug exposure or fetal alcohol spectrum disorder.
Title
Relative to plans of safe care for infants affected by substance abuse or withdrawal symptoms from prenatal drug exposure or fetal alcohol spectrum disorder.
Sponsors
Sen. James Gray [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/26/2018; Chapter 0336; Effective 06/26/2018 |
2018-06-05 | House | Enrolled 05/23/2018 |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Conference Committee Report # 2018-1996c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2018; Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-23 | House | Conference Committee Report 1996c: Adopted, Voice Vote 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-17 | House | Conference Committee Report # 2018-1996c Filed 05/17/2018; House Amendment + New Amendment |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Committee of Conference Meeting: 05/15/2018, 11:00 am, Room 103, Legislative Office Building |
2018-05-10 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Kotowski, LeBrun, J. MacKay, McMahon 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-10 | House | House Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Rep. Kotowski): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Gray, Avard, Hennessey; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-03 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1688h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/03/2018 |
2018-05-03 | House | Amendment # 2018-1688h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/03/2018 |
2018-04-26 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1688h for 05/02/2018 (Vote 22-4; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 17 P. 21 |
2018-04-19 | House | Executive Session: 04/25/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2018-04-18 | House | ==TIME CHANGE== Division III Work Session: 04/19/2018 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2018-04-18 | House | Division III Work Session: 04/20/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2018-04-17 | House | Division III Work Session: 04/18/2018 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2018-04-12 | House | Referred to Finance 04/12/2018 House Journal 12 P. 6 |
2018-04-12 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1339h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/12/2018 House Journal 12 P. 6 |
2018-04-12 | House | Amendment # 2018-1339h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/12/2018 House Journal 12 P. 6 |
2018-04-04 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1339h for 04/12/2018 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 5 |
2018-04-04 | House | Executive Session: 04/03/2018 Legislative Office Building 205 |
2018-03-20 | House | Public Hearing: 03/27/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2018-03-12 | House | Introduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 7 P. 53 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-0310s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/01/2018; Senate Journal 3 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-0310s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/01/2018; Senate Journal 3 |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0310s, 02/01/2018; Senate Calendar 5 |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Hearing: 01/16/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 3 |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 2 |