NH SB544 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - Signed by the Governor on 06/08/2018; Chapter 0235; Effective 06/08/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - Signed by the Governor on 06/08/2018; Chapter 0235; Effective 06/08/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Transferring department of safety funds to the fire standards and training and emergency medical services fund.
Title
Transferring department of safety funds to the fire standards and training and emergency medical services fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-14 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/08/2018; Chapter 0235; Effective 06/08/2018 |
2018-05-15 | House | Enrolled 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/10/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Sen. Daniels Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-04-19 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1409h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/19/2018 House Journal 13 P. 20 |
2018-04-19 | House | Amendment # 2018-1409h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/19/2018 House Journal 13 P. 20 |
2018-04-12 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1409h (NT) for 04/19/2018 (Vote 26-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 12 |
2018-04-05 | House | Executive Session: 04/11/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2018-04-05 | House | Division II Work Session: 04/10/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 209 |
2018-03-28 | House | Division II Work Session: 03/29/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 209 |
2018-03-28 | House | ==CANCELLED== Division I Work Session: 04/03/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2018-03-22 | House | Division II Work Session: 03/28/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 209 |
2018-03-15 | House | Public Hearing: 03/27/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2018-03-12 | House | Introduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Finance House Journal 7 P. 53 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-0615s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/22/2018; Senate Journal 5 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-0615s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/22/2018; Senate Journal 5 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0615s, 02/22/2018; Senate Calendar 8 |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Hearing: 01/30/2018, Room 103, State House, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 5A |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 2 |