NH SB541 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on December 14 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-15 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/15/2024; Senate Journal 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 14 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-15 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/15/2024; Senate Journal 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to retail pet stores.
Title
Relative to retail pet stores.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/15/2024; Senate Journal 4 |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 02/15/2024, Vote 4-0; Senate Calendar 7 |
2023-12-21 | Senate | Hearing: 01/04/2024, Room 103, State House, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 49 |
2023-12-14 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 1 |