NH SB538 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on June 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-13 - II. Remainder Effective 06/06/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on June 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-13 - II. Remainder Effective 06/06/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to children taken into custody under the child protection act and relative to the commission to review child abuse fatalities.
Title
Relative to children taken into custody under the child protection act and relative to the commission to review child abuse fatalities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-13 | Senate | II. Remainder Effective 06/06/2016 |
2016-06-13 | Senate | I. Section 1 Effective 08/05/2016 |
2016-06-13 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/06/2016; Chapter 0201 |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/19/2016); Senate Journal 19 |
2016-05-23 | House | Enrolled 05/19/2016 House Journal 39 P. 24 |
2016-05-11 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 123 |
2016-05-11 | House | Removed from Consent (Rep. Brewster) 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 5 |
2016-04-21 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 05/11/2016 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 29 P. 6 |
2016-04-13 | House | Executive Session: 04/19/2016 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 |
2016-03-22 | House | Public Hearing: 03/29/2016 02:30 PM Legislative Office Building 206 |
2016-03-15 | House | Introduced 03/10/2016 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 25 P. 118 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/10/2016; Senate Journal 8 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/10/2016; Senate Calendar 9 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Hearing: 03/01/2016, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:40 pm; Senate Calendar 7 |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Introduced 01/21/2016 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 3 |