NH SB535 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - Signed by the Governor on 07/02/2018; Chapter 0365; Effective 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - Signed by the Governor on 07/02/2018; Chapter 0365; Effective 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to licensure for the practice of professional art therapy and relative to certain revenues from the sale of commemorative liquor bottles of historic significance.
Title
Relative to licensure for the practice of professional art therapy and relative to certain revenues from the sale of commemorative liquor bottles of historic significance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-02 - House - OTPA (Y: 174 N: 156 NV: 36 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 169 N: 157 NV: 40 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 169 N: 157 NV: 40 Abs: 25) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-05 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/02/2018; Chapter 0365; Effective 07/01/2018 |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-06-11 | House | Enrolled 05/23/2018 |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-2117e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-06-05 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-2117e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Conference Committee Report # 2018-2068c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2018; Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-23 | House | Conference Committee Report 2068c: Adopted, Voice Vote 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-17 | House | Conference Committee Report # 2018-2068c Filed 05/17/2018; Senate Amendment + New Amendment |
2018-05-16 | House | Conferee Change: Rep. H. Marsh Replaces Rep. Proulx 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | ==RECONVENE== Committee of Conference Meeting: 05/17/2018, 12:00 pm, Room 103, State House |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Committee of Conference Meeting: 05/16/2018, 10:00 am, Room 103, State House ==RECESSED== |
2018-05-10 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Proulx, McGuire, Hoell, Gagnon 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-10 | House | House Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Rep. McGuire): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Reagan, Carson, Soucy; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-02 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1690h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 174-156 05/02/2018 |
2018-05-02 | House | Amendment # 2018-1690h: Amendment Adopted Regular Calendar 169-157 05/02/2018 |
2018-04-26 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2018-04-26 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1690h (NT) for 05/02/2018 (Vote 11-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 17 P. 18 |
2018-04-25 | House | Executive Session: 04/24/2018 Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-04-10 | House | ==CONTINUED== Public Hearing: 04/17/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-03-27 | House | ==RECESSED== Public Hearing: 04/10/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-03-20 | House | Introduced 03/15/2018 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 8 P. 70 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/15/2018; Senate Journal 8 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/15/2018; Senate Calendar 12A |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-0522s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/15/2018; Senate Journal 4 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-0522s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/15/2018; Senate Journal 4 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Without Objection, Rule 3-17 is Suspended to Allow Non-Germane Amendment # 2018-0522s; 2/3 Necessary, Motion Adopted; 02/15/2018; Senate Journal 4 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Chair Ruled Sections of Amendment # 2018-0522s Non-Germane, 02/15/2018; Senate Journal 4 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0522s, 02/15/2018; Senate Calendar 7 |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Hearing: 01/24/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:50 am, on proposed amendment # 2018-0169s; Senate Calendar 4 |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Hearing: 01/24/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:40 am; Senate Calendar 4 |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 2 |