NH SB534 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - II. Remainder shall take effect 06/08/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - II. Remainder shall take effect 06/08/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the classification of certain state employee positions and relative to a review of certain unclassified positions in the department of health and human services.
Title
Relative to the classification of certain state employee positions and relative to a review of certain unclassified positions in the department of health and human services.
Sponsors
Sen. John Reagan [R] | Sen. Lou D'Allesandro [D] | Rep. Frank Byron [R] | Rep. John Sytek [R] |
Rep. Peter Schmidt [D] | Rep. Carol McGuire [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-14 | Senate | II. Remainder shall take effect 06/08/2018 |
2018-06-14 | Senate | I. Sections 1-4 Effective 08/07/2018 |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/08/2018; Chapter 0233 |
2018-05-15 | House | Enrolled 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/10/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-04-26 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1592h: Motion Adopted DV 232-48 04/26/2018 |
2018-04-26 | House | Amendment # 2018-1592h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/26/2018 |
2018-04-19 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1592h (NT) for 04/26/2018 (Vote 25-1; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 12 |
2018-04-12 | House | Division I Work Session: 04/17/2018 01:50 PM Legislative Office Building 212 |
2018-04-12 | House | Public Hearing on non-germane Amendment # 2018-1499h: 04/17/2018 01:40 PM Legislative Office Building 212 |
2018-04-12 | House | Executive Session: 04/18/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2018-04-05 | House | Division I Work Session: 04/10/2018 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 212 |
2018-04-05 | House | Referred to Finance 04/05/2018 House Journal 11 P. 5 |
2018-04-05 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/05/2018 House Journal 11 P. 5 |
2018-03-21 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/05/2018 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 5 |
2018-03-20 | House | Executive Session: 03/20/2018 Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-03-14 | House | Public Hearing: 03/20/2018 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-03-12 | House | Introduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 7 P. 52 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/15/2018; Senate Journal 4 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/15/2018; Senate Calendar 7 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-0275s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/01/2018; Senate Journal 3 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-0275s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/01/2018; Senate Journal 3 |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0275s, 02/01/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 5 |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Hearing: 01/24/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 4 |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 2 |