NH SB531 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-10 - Signed by the Governor on 07/03/2024; Chapter 0167; Effective 09/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-10 - Signed by the Governor on 07/03/2024; Chapter 0167; Effective 09/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to background checks of municipal health officers.
Title
Relative to background checks of municipal health officers.
Sponsors
Sen. James Gray [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/03/2024; Chapter 0167; Effective 09/01/2024 |
2024-06-19 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 |
2024-06-19 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/13/2024); Senate Journal 18 |
2024-05-09 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/09/2024 House Journal 13 P. 5 |
2024-04-29 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass 04/23/2024 (Vote 17-1; Consent Calendar) |
2024-04-17 | House | Executive Session: 04/23/2024 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2024-04-10 | House | Public Hearing: 04/17/2024 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2024-03-02 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 02/22/2024 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 6 P. 140 |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/15/2024; Senate Journal 4 |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/15/2024, Vote 3-0; Senate Calendar 7 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Hearing: 02/06/2024, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 6 |
2023-12-14 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 1 |