NH SB53 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by the Governor on 07/10/2019; Chapter 187; Effective 09/08/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to maintenance of roads and highways to summer cottages.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to maintenance of roads and highways to summer cottages.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-15SenateSigned by the Governor on 07/10/2019; Chapter 187; Effective 09/08/2019
2019-06-18HouseEnrolled 06/13/2019 House Journal 19 P. 18
2019-06-18SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/13/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-06-05HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/05/2019 House Journal 17 P. 79
2019-05-21HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-05-21HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 06/05/2019 (Vote 16-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 27 P. 18
2019-05-08HouseExecutive Session: 05/14/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301
2019-04-10HousePublic Hearing: 04/16/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301
2019-03-21HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 11 P. 69
2019-02-14SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5
2019-02-07SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/14/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 10
2019-01-28SenateHearing: 02/05/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 02:30 pm; Senate Calendar 9
2019-01-17SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback