NH SB529 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Placed on Laid on Table Consent List and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Placed on Laid on Table Consent List and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the New Hampshire excellence in higher education scholarship program and establishing a workforce development student debt relief program and fund.
Title
Relative to the New Hampshire excellence in higher education scholarship program and establishing a workforce development student debt relief program and fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Placed on Laid on Table Consent List and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-1178s Senate Calendar 11 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Hearing: 03/10/2020, Room 103, State House, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 10 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Introduced 01/30/2020 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 3 |