NH SB525 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - Interim Study Subcommittee Work Session: 09/18/2018 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building207
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting the distribution of adult education financial assistance to any student who is not a legal resident.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting the distribution of adult education financial assistance to any student who is not a legal resident.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-02 - Senate - Interim Study (Y: 233 N: 97 NV: 32 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Lay On Table (Y: 11 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Sen. Sanborn Floor Amendment 1023s (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 11 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-13HouseInterim Study Subcommittee Work Session: 09/18/2018 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building207
2018-09-10HouseExecutive Session: 10/17/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building207
2018-08-22House==CANCELLED== Interim Study Full Committee Work Session: 10/17/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building207
2018-05-02HouseRefer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 233-97 05/02/2018
2018-04-24HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2018-04-24HouseMajority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 05/02/2018 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 17 P. 14
2018-04-03HouseExecutive Session: 04/17/2018 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 207
2018-03-21HousePublic Hearing: 03/28/2018 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 207
2018-03-20HouseIntroduced 03/15/2018 and referred to Education House Journal 8 P. 70
2018-03-15SenateOT3rdg; 03/15/2018; Senate Journal 8
2018-03-15SenateSen. Daniels Waived Referral to Finance; 03/15/2018; Senate Journal 8
2018-03-15SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2018-1023s, Regular Calendar 13Y-11N, Motion Adopted; 03/15/2018; Senate Journal 8
2018-03-15SenateSen. Feltes Moved Laid on Table, Regular Calendar 11Y-13N, Motion Failed; 03/15/2018; Senate Journal 8
2018-03-15SenateSen. Sanborn Floor Amendment # 2018-1023s, Regular Calendar 13Y-11N, Amendment Adopted; 03/15/2018; Senate Journal 8
2018-03-15SenateWithout Objection, Sen. Avard Moved the Question, Motion Adopted; 03/15/2018; Senate Journal 8
2018-03-15SenateSen. Sanborn Offered Floor Amendment # 2018-1023s; 03/15/2018; Senate Journal 8
2018-03-15SenateSen. Sanborn Moved Ought to Pass; 03/15/2018; Senate Journal 8
2018-03-15SenateInexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 11Y-13N, Motion Failed; 03/15/2018; Senate Journal 8
2018-03-14SenateCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/15/2018;
2018-03-14SenateSpecial Order to 03/15/2018, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/14/2018 Senate Journal 7
2018-03-08SenateCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/14/2018; Senate Calendar 11
2018-03-08SenateSpecial Order to the next session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6
2018-03-08SenateSen. Sanborn Moved to Remove SB 525-FN from the Consent Calendar; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6
2018-02-20SenateCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; 03/08/2018; Senate Calendar 9
2018-01-30SenateHearing: 02/13/2018, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 6
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 2

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2805&sy=2018&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=SB525
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2018&id=1821&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2018&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=1821
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=120&sy=2018&lb=S&eb=SB0525&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=SB525&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2805
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=121&sy=2018&lb=S&eb=SB0525&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=SB525&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2805
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=122&sy=2018&lb=S&eb=SB0525&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=SB525&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2805
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=123&sy=2018&lb=S&eb=SB0525&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=SB525&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2805
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=202&sy=2018&lb=H&eb=SB0525&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=SB525&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2805

Bill Comments

feedback