NH SB516 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on December 14 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-05 - Pending Motion Ought to Pass; 04/05/2024; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 14 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-05 - Pending Motion Ought to Pass; 04/05/2024; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to prohibiting collective bargaining agreements that require employees to join a labor union.
Title
Relative to prohibiting collective bargaining agreements that require employees to join a labor union.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | Senate | Pending Motion Ought to Pass; 04/05/2024; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Sen. Avard Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/05/2024; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/05/2024, Vote 3-2; Senate Calendar 13 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Hearing: 03/19/2024, Room 100, State House, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 11 |
2023-12-14 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 1 |