NH SB516 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-04 - Signed by the Governor on 05/30/2018; Chapter 0153; Effective 05/30/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-04 - Signed by the Governor on 05/30/2018; Chapter 0153; Effective 05/30/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting motorcycle-only checkpoints.
Title
Prohibiting motorcycle-only checkpoints.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-04 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 05/30/2018; Chapter 0153; Effective 05/30/2018 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 04/26/2018); Senate Journal 15 |
2018-05-01 | House | Enrolled 04/26/2018 |
2018-04-12 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/12/2018 House Journal 12 P. 21 |
2018-04-04 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/12/2018 (Vote 13-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 9 |
2018-04-04 | House | Executive Session: 04/03/2018 Legislative Office Building 203 |
2018-03-21 | House | Public Hearing: 03/27/2018 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2018-03-12 | House | Introduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Transportation House Journal 7 P. 52 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-0666s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/22/2018; Senate Journal 5 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Sen. Birdsell Floor Amendment # 2018-0666s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/22/2018; Senate Journal 5 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/22/2018; Senate Calendar 8 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Hearing: 02/06/2018, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 6 |
2017-12-20 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 1 |