NH SB510 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - Signed by the Governor on 06/08/2018; Chapter 0232; Effective 01/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - Signed by the Governor on 06/08/2018; Chapter 0232; Effective 01/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to municipal notice of leases on tax-exempt property.
Title
Relative to municipal notice of leases on tax-exempt property.
Sponsors
Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Rep. Rebecca Mcbeath [D] | Rep. Robert Cushing [D] | Rep. Wayne Burton [D] |
Rep. Marjorie Smith [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-14 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/08/2018; Chapter 0232; Effective 01/01/2019 |
2018-05-15 | House | Enrolled 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/10/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Sen. Gray Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-04-19 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1474h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/19/2018 House Journal 13 P. 11 |
2018-04-19 | House | Amendment # 2018-1474h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/19/2018 House Journal 13 P. 11 |
2018-04-12 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1474h for 04/19/2018 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 8 |
2018-04-12 | House | Executive Session: 04/11/2018 Legislative Office Building 301 |
2018-03-14 | House | Public Hearing: 03/27/2018 01:50 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2018-03-12 | House | Introduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 7 P. 52 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-0523s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/15/2018; Senate Journal 4 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-0523s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/15/2018; Senate Journal 4 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0523s, 02/15/2018; Senate Calendar 7 |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Hearing: 01/31/2018, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:20 am; Senate Calendar 3 |
2017-12-20 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 1 |