NH SB510 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-10 - Signed by the Governor on 06/03/2016; Chapter 0191; Effective 07/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-10 - Signed by the Governor on 06/03/2016; Chapter 0191; Effective 07/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to parking at state park parking meters.
Title
Relative to parking at state park parking meters.
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Stiles [R] | Rep. John Mullen [R] | Rep. Judith Spang [D] | Rep. Chris Christensen [R] |
Sen. Jerry Little [R] | Rep. Frederick Rice [R] | Rep. Suzanne Gottling [D] | Sen. David Watters [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-20 - House - OTP (Y: 246 N: 99 NV: 13 Abs: 40) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/03/2016; Chapter 0191; Effective 07/01/2016 |
2016-06-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/03/2016; Chapter 0192; Effective 07/01/2016 |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/19/2016); Senate Journal 19 |
2016-05-23 | House | Enrolled 05/19/2016 House Journal 39 P. 24 |
2016-05-11 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 35 |
2016-05-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 05/11/2016 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 29 P. 15 |
2016-04-20 | House | Executive Session: 04/27/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2016-04-20 | House | Public Hearing: 04/26/2016 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2016-04-20 | House | Referred to Ways and Means 04/20/2016 House Journal 36 P. 35 |
2016-04-20 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 246-99 04/20/2016 House Journal 36 P. 33 |
2016-04-13 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate House Calendar 24 P. 17 |
2016-04-13 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/20/2016 (Vote 14-3; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 24 P. 17 |
2016-04-06 | House | Executive Session: 04/12/2016 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2016-03-30 | House | Public Hearing: 04/05/2016 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2016-03-29 | House | Introduced 03/23/2016 and referred to Transportation House Journal 27 P. 68 |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/17/2016; Senate Journal 9 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/17/2016; Senate Calendar 10 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0380s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/11/2016; Senate Journal 5 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0380s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/11/2016 |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-0380s, 02/11/2016; Senate Calendar 5 |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Hearing: 02/02/2016, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 4 |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Introduced 01/14/2016 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 2 |