NH SB51 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Sen. Hennessey Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/13/2019; Senate Journal 20
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a commission to study expanding mental health courts statewide.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a commission to study expanding mental health courts statewide.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-13SenateSen. Hennessey Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/13/2019; Senate Journal 20
2019-05-02HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1504h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2019 House Journal 14 P. 5
2019-05-02HouseAmendment # 2019-1504h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2019 House Journal 14 P. 5
2019-04-24HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1504h for 05/02/2019 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 22 P. 5
2019-04-10HouseExecutive Session: 04/18/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2019-04-10HouseDivision I Subcommittee Work Session: 04/17/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 104
2019-04-10HouseDivision I Subcommittee Work Session: 04/16/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 104
2019-03-27HousePublic Hearing: 04/03/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 205
2019-03-21HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 11 P. 69
2019-02-14SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5
2019-02-14SenateSpecial Order to the Present Time, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5
2019-02-04SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/14/2019; Senate Calendar 10
2019-01-17SenateHearing: 01/22/2019, Room 100, State House, 09:35 am; Senate Calendar 7
2019-01-17SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback