NH SB509 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 02/15/2018; Senate Journal 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 02/15/2018; Senate Journal 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allowing municipalities to require income and expense information of business properties for tax appraisals.
Title
Allowing municipalities to require income and expense information of business properties for tax appraisals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 02/15/2018; Senate Journal 4 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 02/15/2018; Senate Calendar 7 |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Hearing: 01/31/2018, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 3 |
2017-12-20 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 1 |