NH SB506 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a commission to study workplace safety in health care settings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a commission to study workplace safety in health care settings.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-23HouseDied on Table
2020-06-30HouseVacated and Laid on Table Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 3
2020-03-10House==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 03/19/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2020-03-03House==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 03/18/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2020-03-03House==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 03/18/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2020-03-02HouseIntroduced 02/20/2020 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 5 P. 56
2020-02-06SenateOught to Pass with Amendments 2020-0315s and 2020-0529s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/06/2020; Senate Journal 3
2020-02-06SenateSen. Sherman Floor Amendment # 2020-0529s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/06/2020; Senate Journal 3
2020-02-06SenateCommittee Amendment # 2020-0315s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/06/2020; Senate Journal 3
2020-01-30SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0315s, 02/06/2020; Senate Calendar 5
2020-01-08SenateTo Be Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 1
2020-01-08SenateHearing: 01/14/2020, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 2

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback