NH SB506 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Signed by the Governor on 06/25/2018; Chapter 0325; Effective 08/24/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Signed by the Governor on 06/25/2018; Chapter 0325; Effective 08/24/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Limiting amendments to warrant articles.
Title
Limiting amendments to warrant articles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/25/2018; Chapter 0325; Effective 08/24/2018 |
2018-06-05 | House | Enrolled 05/23/2018 |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Conference Committee Report # 2018-2010c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2018; Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-23 | House | Conference Committee Report 2010c: Adopted, Voice Vote 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-17 | House | Conference Committee Report # 2018-2010c Filed 05/17/2018; As Amended by the House |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Committee of Conference Meeting: 05/15/2018, 01:30 pm, Room 103, Legislative Office Building |
2018-05-10 | House | Conferee Change: Rep. Hinch Replaces Rep. Sterling 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-10 | House | Conferee Change: Rep. J. Graham Replaces Rep. J. Belanger 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-10 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Matthews, Treleaven, Sterling, J. Belanger 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-10 | House | House Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Rep. J. Belanger): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Gray, Giuda, Kahn; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Sen. Gray Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-04-19 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1300h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/19/2018 House Journal 13 P. 11 |
2018-04-19 | House | Amendment # 2018-1300h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/19/2018 House Journal 13 P. 11 |
2018-04-11 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1300h for 04/19/2018 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 8 |
2018-04-11 | House | Executive Session: 04/11/2018 Legislative Office Building 301 |
2018-03-14 | House | Public Hearing: 03/27/2018 10:20 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2018-03-12 | House | Introduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 7 P. 53 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-0818s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-0818s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0818s, 03/08/2018; Senate Calendar 9 |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Hearing: 01/24/2018, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:20 am; Senate Calendar 3 |
2017-12-20 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 1 |