NH SB505 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-04 - Signed by the Governor on 05/30/2018; Chapter 0150; Effective 01/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-04 - Signed by the Governor on 05/30/2018; Chapter 0150; Effective 01/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring abutter notice of the construction of a crematory.
Title
Requiring abutter notice of the construction of a crematory.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Giuda [R] | Sen. James Gray [R] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Rep. Herb Vadney [R] |
Rep. Norman Silber [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-04 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 05/30/2018; Chapter 0150; Effective 01/01/2019 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 04/26/2018); Senate Journal 15 |
2018-05-01 | House | Enrolled 04/26/2018 |
2018-04-19 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/19/2018 House Journal 13 P. 11 |
2018-04-11 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/19/2018 (Vote 11-3; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 8 |
2018-04-11 | House | Executive Session: 04/11/2018 Legislative Office Building 301 |
2018-03-14 | House | Public Hearing: 03/27/2018 10:40 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2018-03-12 | House | Introduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 7 P. 52 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/15/2018; Senate Journal 4 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/15/2018; Senate Calendar 7 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Hearing: 01/17/2018, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:30 am; Senate Calendar 2 |
2017-12-20 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 1 |