NH SB503 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-04 - Signed by the Governor on 05/30/2018; Chapter 0148; Effective 04/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-04 - Signed by the Governor on 05/30/2018; Chapter 0148; Effective 04/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to increasing the maximum amount of the optional veterans' tax credit.
Title
Relative to increasing the maximum amount of the optional veterans' tax credit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-19 - House - ITL (Y: 147 N: 185 NV: 26 Abs: 34) [FAIL]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Sen. Gannon Floor Amendment 0793s (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Sen. Gannon Floor Amendment 0793s (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-04 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 05/30/2018; Chapter 0148; Effective 04/01/2018 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 04/26/2018); Senate Journal 15 |
2018-05-01 | House | Enrolled 04/26/2018 |
2018-04-19 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/19/2018 House Journal 13 P. 29 |
2018-04-19 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Failed Regular Calendar 147-185 04/19/2018 House Journal 13 P. 27 |
2018-04-12 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2018-04-12 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 04/19/2018 (Vote 11-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 14 |
2018-04-12 | House | Executive Session: 04/11/2018 Legislative Office Building 301 |
2018-03-14 | House | Public Hearing: 03/27/2018 11:20 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2018-03-12 | House | Introduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 7 P. 52 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-0793s, Regular Calendar 22Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 02/22/2018; Senate Journal 5 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Sen. Gannon Floor Amendment # 2018-0793s, Regular Calendar 22Y-0N, Amendment Adopted; 02/22/2018; Senate Journal 5 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Sen. Gannon Moved Ought to Pass; 02/22/2018; Senate Journal 5 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 11Y-11N, Motion Failed; 02/22/2018; Senate Journal 5 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 02/22/2018; Senate Journal 4 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Special Order to 02/22/2018, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 02/15/2018 Senate Journal 4 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 02/15/2018; Senate Calendar 7 |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Hearing: 01/24/2018, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 3 |
2017-12-20 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 1 |