NH SB50 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-20 - Signed by the Governor on 06/20/2013; Chapter 0093; Effective 08/19/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-20 - Signed by the Governor on 06/20/2013; Chapter 0093; Effective 08/19/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to expiration of variances and special exceptions.
Title
Relative to expiration of variances and special exceptions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-20 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/20/2013; Chapter 0093; Effective 08/19/2013 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Enrolled 5/2/13 |
2013-05-08 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 41, PG.1424 |
2013-05-08 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 41, PG.1390 |
2013-04-30 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for May 8 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar36, PG.1198 |
2013-04-24 | House | Executive Session: 4/30/2013 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2013-04-09 | House | Public Hearing: 4/17/2013 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2013-03-27 | House | Introduced and Referred to Municipal and County Government; House Journal 31, PG.1074 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0238s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 5 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0238s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-0238s, 2/14/13; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 8 |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Hearing: 2/6/13, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 7 |
2013-01-03 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Public & Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 4 |