NH SB5 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-29 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 36, PG. 1578
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-29 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 36, PG. 1578
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to transfers into the revenue stabilization reserve account.
Title
Relative to transfers into the revenue stabilization reserve account.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-12 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-29 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 36, PG. 1578 |
2015-04-16 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Apr 29 (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 32, PG. 1483 |
2015-04-08 | House | Executive Session: 4/16/2015 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2015-04-02 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 4/9/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2015-04-02 | House | Public Hearing: 4/8/2015 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2015-03-04 | House | Introduced and Referred to Finance; House Journal 22, PG. 628 |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Regular Calendar 14Y-9N; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 5 |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 2/12/15; Senate Calendar 9 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Hearing: 2/3/15, Room 103, State House, 3:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 7 |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 4 |