NH SB497 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 168-136 04/26/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 168-136 04/26/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to breast-feeding.
Title
Relative to breast-feeding.
Sponsors
Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Sen. Bette Lasky [D] | Rep. Rebecca Mcbeath [D] | Rep. Edward Butler [D] |
Rep. Robert Cushing [D] | Rep. Michael Cahill [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 168-136 04/26/2018 |
2018-04-20 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1231h |
2018-04-20 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 04/26/2018 (Vote 8-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 14 |
2018-04-18 | House | Executive Session: 04/11/2018 Legislative Office Building 208 |
2018-03-14 | House | Public Hearing: 03/20/2018 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 208 |
2018-03-12 | House | Introduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 7 P. 53 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-0586s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-0586s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0586s, 03/08/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 10A |
2018-01-05 | Senate | Hearing: 01/16/2018, Room 100, State House, 09:20 am; Senate Calendar 2A |
2017-12-20 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 1 |