NH SB497 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-18 - Refer to Interim Study, Regular Calendar 13Y-10N, Motion Adopted; 02/18/2016; Senate Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-18 - Refer to Interim Study, Regular Calendar 13Y-10N, Motion Adopted; 02/18/2016; Senate Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to disposition of meals and rooms tax revenues to towns and cities.
Title
Relative to disposition of meals and rooms tax revenues to towns and cities.
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Stiles [R] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Rep. John Tholl [R] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] |
Sen. Dan Feltes [D] | Rep. Edmond Gionet [R] | Sen. Jeff Woodburn [D] | Rep. Tracy Emerick [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-18 - Senate - Refer to Interim Study (Y: 13 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-18 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Regular Calendar 13Y-10N, Motion Adopted; 02/18/2016; Senate Journal 6 |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 02/18/2016; Senate Calendar 6 |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Hearing: 01/26/2016, Room 103, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 3 |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Introduced 01/06/2016 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 1 |