NH SB495 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-09-20 - Executive Session: 10/09/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to certification of alcohol and other drug use treatment facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to certification of alcohol and other drug use treatment facilities.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-09-20HouseExecutive Session: 10/09/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207
2024-09-20HouseFull Committee Work Session: 10/09/2024 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207
2024-08-09HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 09/12/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207
2024-05-02HouseRefer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2024 House Journal 12 P. 16
2024-04-25HouseCommittee Report: Refer for Interim Study 04/24/2024 (Vote 19-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 17 P. 11
2024-04-12HouseExecutive Session: 04/17/2024 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208
2024-04-12HousePublic Hearing: 04/17/2024 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208
2024-04-12HouseIntroduced 04/12/2024 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 11 P. 103
2024-04-11SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2024-1420s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/11/2024; Senate Journal 9
2024-04-11SenateCommittee Amendment # 2024-1420s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/11/2024; Senate Journal 9
2024-04-03SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2024-1420s, 04/11/2024, Vote 7-0; Senate Calendar 14
2024-02-08SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2024-0407s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/08/2024; Senate Journal 3
2024-02-08SenateCommittee Amendment # 2024-0407s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/08/2024; Senate Journal 3
2024-02-01SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0407s, 02/08/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 6
2024-01-11SenateHearing: 01/17/2024, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 3
2023-12-13SenateTo Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 1

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback