NH SB491 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - II. Remainder Effective 06/25/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - II. Remainder Effective 06/25/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to food protection services in New Hampshire.
Title
Relative to food protection services in New Hampshire.
Sponsors
Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Rep. Phyllis Katsakiores [R] | Rep. Martin Bove [R] |
Rep. Mariellen MacKay [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-29 | Senate | II. Remainder Effective 06/25/2018 |
2018-06-29 | Senate | I. Section 28 Effective 06/30/2021 |
2018-06-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/25/2018; Chapter 0323 |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-06-11 | House | Enrolled 05/23/2018 |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-2114e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-06-05 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-2114e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Conference Committee Report # 2018-2046c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2018; Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-23 | House | Conference Committee Report 2046c: Adopted, Voice Vote 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-17 | House | Conference Committee Report # 2018-2046c Filed 05/17/2018; Senate Amendment + New Amendment |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Committee of Conference Meeting: 05/16/2018, 10:00 am, Room 100, State House |
2018-05-10 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. John T. O'Connor, Darrow, Pearl, Bixby 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-10 | House | House Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Rep. John T. O'Connor): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Bradley, Avard, Fuller Clark; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-04-12 | House | Referral Waived by Committee Chair per House Rule 46(f) 04/12/2018 House Journal 12 P. 26 |
2018-04-12 | House | Referred to Finance 04/12/2018 House Journal 12 P. 3 |
2018-04-12 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1325h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/12/2018 House Journal 12 P. 3 |
2018-04-12 | House | Amendment # 2018-1325h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/12/2018 House Journal 12 P. 3 |
2018-04-04 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1325h (NT) for 04/12/2018 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 4 |
2018-04-04 | House | Executive Session: 04/04/2018 Legislative Office Building 303 |
2018-03-28 | House | Public Hearing: 04/04/2018 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2018-03-27 | House | Introduced 03/22/2018 and referred to Environment and Agriculture House Journal 10 P. 53 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-1104s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/21/2018; Senate Journal 9 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-1104s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/21/2018; Senate Journal 9 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1104s, 03/21/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 13 |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Hearing: 01/30/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 5 |
2017-12-20 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 1 |