NH SB489 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - Signed by the Governor on 06/08/2018; Chapter 0229; Effective 06/08/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - Signed by the Governor on 06/08/2018; Chapter 0229; Effective 06/08/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study parental alienation in New Hampshire.
Title
Establishing a committee to study parental alienation in New Hampshire.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Avard [R] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Sen. Bob Giuda [R] | Rep. Kimberly Rice [R] |
Rep. John Burt [R] | Rep. John Carr [R] | Rep. Carl Seidel [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-14 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/08/2018; Chapter 0229; Effective 06/08/2018 |
2018-05-15 | House | Enrolled 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/10/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-04-19 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1395h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/19/2018 House Journal 13 P. 3 |
2018-04-19 | House | Amendment # 2018-1395h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/19/2018 House Journal 13 P. 3 |
2018-04-11 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1395h for 04/19/2018 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 3 |
2018-04-11 | House | Executive Session: 04/10/2018 Legislative Office Building 206 |
2018-03-14 | House | Public Hearing: 03/27/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2018-03-12 | House | Introduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 7 P. 52 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-0514s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/15/2018; Senate Journal 4 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-0514s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/15/2018; Senate Journal 4 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0514s, 02/15/2018; Senate Calendar 7 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Hearing: 02/06/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 6 |
2017-12-20 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 1 |