NH SB485 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-01 - Reconsider CofC report 2090c (Rep. W. O'Brien): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 157-187 06/01/2016 House Journal 42 P. 26
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-01 - Reconsider CofC report 2090c (Rep. W. O'Brien): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 157-187 06/01/2016 House Journal 42 P. 26
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a state grant program to assist state and local law enforcement agencies in addressing the opioid crisis and making an appropriation therefor, relative to the health care premium contribution for retired state employees who are eligible for Medicare Parts A and B due to age or disability, relative to funding of retiree health benefits, and making an appropriation to the department of administrative services.
Title
Establishing a state grant program to assist state and local law enforcement agencies in addressing the opioid crisis and making an appropriation therefor, relative to the health care premium contribution for retired state employees who are eligible for Medicare Parts A and B due to age or disability, relative to funding of retiree health benefits, and making an appropriation to the department of administrative services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-01 - House - Reconsider (Y: 157 N: 187 NV: 24 Abs: 30) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | House | Reconsider CofC report 2090c (Rep. W. O'Brien): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 157-187 06/01/2016 House Journal 42 P. 26 |
2016-06-01 | House | Conference Committee Report 2090c: Failed, DV 159-160 06/01/2016 House Journal 42 P. 26 |
2016-05-27 | House | Conference Committee Report #2016-2090c Filed 05/26/2016; House Amendment + New Amendment |
2016-05-26 | House | Conferee Change: Rep. Chandler Replaces Rep. Rosenwald 05/19/2016 House Journal 39 P. 30 |
2016-05-24 | Senate | ==RECONVENE== Committee of Conference Meeting: 05/25/2016, 01:30 pm, Room 103, State House |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Committee of Conference Meeting: 05/24/2016, 01:00 pm, Room 103, State House==RECESSED== |
2016-05-19 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Kurk, L. Ober, Hinch, Rosenwald 05/19/2016 House Journal 39 P. 17 |
2016-05-19 | House | House Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Rep. Kurk): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/19/2016 House Journal 39 P. 17 |
2016-05-19 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Forrester, Little, D'Allesandro; 05/19/2016; Senate Journal 18 |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Sen. Forrester Moved Nonconcur with House Amendment # 1857h, New Title, Requests C of C, Motion Adopted Voice Vote; 05/19/2016 Senate Journal 18 |
2016-05-11 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1857h: Motion Adopted DV 213-95 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 90 |
2016-05-11 | House | Divide Section 14 (Rep. Goley): Motion Failed DV 131-187 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 90 |
2016-05-11 | House | Divide Sections 1-6 and 7-13 (Rep. D. McGuire): Motion Failed DV 89-235 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 90 |
2016-05-11 | House | Amendment #2016-1857h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 86 |
2016-05-05 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate House Calendar 29 P. 23 |
2016-05-05 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-1857h (NT) for 05/11/2016 (Vote 25-1; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 29 P. 23 |
2016-04-21 | House | Executive Session: 05/04/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2016-05-03 | House | ==CONTINUED== Division II Work Session: 05/04/2016 08:55 Amendment Legislative Office Building 209 |
2016-04-28 | House | ==RECESSED== Division II Work Session: 05/03/2016 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 209 |
2016-04-28 | House | Public Hearing on non-germane Amendment #2016-1651h: 05/03/2016 09:50 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2016-04-21 | House | ==RECESSED== Division II Work Session: 04/28/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 209 |
2016-03-16 | House | Public Hearing: 03/29/2016 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2016-02-17 | House | Introduced 02/11/2016 and referred to Finance House Journal 17 P. 51 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0370s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/04/2016; Senate Journal 4 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0370s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/04/2016 |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-0370s, 02/04/2016; Senate Calendar 4A |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Hearing: 01/26/2016, Room 103, State House, 02:20 pm; Senate Calendar 3 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | Introduced 01/06/2016 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 1 |