NH SB483 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-21 - Signed by the Governor on 06/16/2016; Chapter 0272; Effective 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-21 - Signed by the Governor on 06/16/2016; Chapter 0272; Effective 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing the position of chartered public school program officer in the department of education.
Title
Establishing the position of chartered public school program officer in the department of education.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Feltes [D] | Rep. Mary Gorman [D] | Rep. Kenneth Weyler [R] | Rep. Mary Gile [D] |
Rep. Roderick Ladd [R] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Sen. Jerry Little [R] | Sen. Nancy Stiles [R] |
Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Rep. June Frazer [D] | Rep. David Bates [R] | Rep. Mary Heath [D] |
Rep. Mel Myler [D] | Rep. David Luneau [D] | Sen. John Reagan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-21 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/16/2016; Chapter 0272; Effective 07/01/2017 |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/01/2016); Senate Journal 20 |
2016-06-08 | House | Enrolled 06/01/2016 |
2016-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2016-2112e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/01/2016); Senate Journal 20 |
2016-06-03 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2016-2112e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/01/2016 House Journal 42 P. 57 |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Sen. Reagan Moved to Concur with House Amendment # 1362h, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/19/2016; Senate Journal 18 |
2016-05-11 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1362h: Motion Adopted DV 207-134 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 56 |
2016-05-11 | House | Amendment #2016-1362h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 56 |
2016-04-21 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate House Calendar 29 P. 19 |
2016-04-21 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-1362h (NT) for 05/11/2016 (Vote 14-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 29 P. 19 |
2016-04-05 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 04/12/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2016-03-29 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 04/05/2016 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2016-03-23 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 03/29/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2016-03-16 | House | Public Hearing: 03/22/2016 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2016-03-15 | House | Introduced 03/10/2016 and referred to Education House Journal 25 P. 118 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0641s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/03/2016; Senate Journal 7 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0641s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/03/2016 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-0641s, New Title, 03/03/2016; Senate Calendar 7 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0342s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/11/2016; Senate Journal 5 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0342s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/11/2016 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-0342s, 02/11/2016; Senate Calendar 5 |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Hearing: 01/26/2016, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 3 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | Introduced 01/06/2016 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 1 |