NH SB479 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-02 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2024 House Journal 12 P. 14
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to recognizing the second Thursday in October as children's environmental health day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to recognizing the second Thursday in October as children's environmental health day.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-02HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2024 House Journal 12 P. 14
2024-04-18HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 04/10/2024 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 17 P. 10
2024-04-18HouseExecutive Session: 04/10/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308
2024-03-27HousePublic Hearing: 04/10/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308
2024-03-02HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 02/22/2024 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 6 P. 139
2024-02-21SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/21/2024; Senate Journal 5
2024-02-15SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/21/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 8
2024-01-24SenateHearing: 02/07/2024, Room 103, State House, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 5
2023-12-13SenateTo Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 1

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback