NH SB470 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the reporting of law enforcement misconduct to the police standards and training council.
Title
Relative to the reporting of law enforcement misconduct to the police standards and training council.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Hearing: 02/11/2020, Room 100, State House, 10:30 am; Senate Calendar 6 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 1 |