NH SB469 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 03/05/2020; Senate Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to shooting ranges.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to shooting ranges.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-05 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-05SenateInexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 03/05/2020; Senate Journal 5
2020-02-18SenateCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/05/2020; Senate Calendar 9
2020-01-08SenateHearing: 01/23/2020, Room 100, State House, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 2
2020-01-08SenateTo Be Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 1

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback