NH SB469 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-04 - Signed by the Governor on 05/30/2018; Chapter 0139; Effective 07/29/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the appropriation of funds from the equipment inventory fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the appropriation of funds from the equipment inventory fund.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-04SenateSigned by the Governor on 05/30/2018; Chapter 0139; Effective 07/29/2018
2018-05-01SenateEnrolled (In recess 04/26/2018); Senate Journal 15
2018-05-01HouseEnrolled 04/26/2018
2018-04-18SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-1460e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 04/12/2018); Senate Journal 13
2018-04-17HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-1460e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/12/2018 House Journal 12 P. 29
2018-04-05HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/05/2018 House Journal 11 P. 6
2018-03-29HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/05/2018 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 5
2018-03-20HouseExecutive Session: 03/28/2018 03:00 PM Legislative Office Building 201
2018-03-20HousePublic Hearing: 03/28/2018 10:40 am Legislative Office Building 201
2018-03-12HouseIntroduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Public Works and Highways House Journal 7 P. 52
2018-01-18SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2018-0081s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 01/18/2018; Senate Journal 2
2018-01-18SenateCommittee Amendment # 2018-0081s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/18/2018; Senate Journal 2
2018-01-10SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0081s, 01/18/2018; Senate Calendar 3
2017-12-21SenateHearing: 01/09/2018, Room 103, State House, 01:10 pm; Senate Calendar 49
2017-12-20SenateTo Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 1

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback