NH SB469 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-11 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/11/2016; Senate Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to criminal record checks of wrecker operators.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to criminal record checks of wrecker operators.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-02-11SenateRefer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/11/2016; Senate Journal 5
2016-02-02SenateCommittee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 02/11/2016; Senate Calendar 5
2016-01-27SenateHearing: ===RECONVENE=== 02/02/2016, Room 100, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 4
2016-01-27SenateHearing: ===RECESSED=== 01/26/2016, Room 100, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 4
2016-01-06SenateIntroduced 01/06/2016 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 1

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback