NH SB469 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-24 - Senate Refer to Interim Study, Regular Calendar 13Y-11N, Motion Adopted; Senate Journal 11, Pg.192

Summary

Requiring the department of labor to warn employers of certain violations prior to imposing a fine.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring the department of labor to warn employers of certain violations prior to imposing a fine.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-24 Senate Refer to Interim Study, Regular Calendar 13Y-11N, Motion Adopted; Senate Journal 11, Pg.192
2010-03-18 Senate Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study 3/24/10; Senate Calendar 12
2010-03-11 Senate Hearing: === TIME CHANGE === March 18, 2010, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 2:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 11
2010-03-05 Senate Hearing: === RECONVENE === March 18, 2010, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 1:45 p.m.; Senate Calendar 10A
2010-03-05 Senate Hearing: === RECESSED === March 4, 2010, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 2:15 p.m.; Senate Calendar 10A
2010-02-24 Senate Hearing: March 4, 2010, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 2:15 p.m.; Senate Calendar 9
2010-01-14 Senate Introduced and Referred to Commerce, Labor and Consumer Protection; Senate Journal 2, Pg.30

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback