NH SB465 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Ought to Pass with Amendment 021320s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; [&]; Senate Journal 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Ought to Pass with Amendment 021320s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; [&]; Senate Journal 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the cost estimate or fiscal note requirement for legislation proposing a study.
Title
Relative to the cost estimate or fiscal note requirement for legislation proposing a study.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 021320s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; [&]; Senate Journal 4 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 02/13/2020; Senate Journal 4 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 02/13/2020; Senate Calendar 6 |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Hearing: 01/21/2020, Room 103, State House, 02:10 pm; Senate Calendar 3 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 1 |