NH SB463 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to aggregation of electric utility customers.
Title
Relative to aggregation of electric utility customers.
Sponsors
Sen. Harold French [R] | Sen. James Gray [R] | Sen. Lou D'Allesandro [D] | Sen. Bob Giuda [R] |
Sen. John Reagan [R] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Rep. John Plumer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Hearing: 03/10/2020, Room 103, State House, 09:40 am; Senate Calendar 10 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 1 |