NH SB46 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-18 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0419s, 03/04/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the use of electronic poll books by cities and towns.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the use of electronic poll books by cities and towns.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-18SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0419s, 03/04/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 12
2021-01-13SenateRemote Hearing: 01/21/2021, 09:20 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 7
2021-01-13SenateIntroduced 01/06/2021 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 3

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback